Hunichen v. Atonomi LLC et al
Defendant: Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, Woody Benson, Don Deloach, Wayne Wisehart, CENTRI Technology Inc, James Salter, Vaughn Emery, David Fragale, Rob Strickland, Kyle Strickland, Vaughan Emery, LaunchCapital, LLC and M37 Ventures, Inc
Counter Defendant: Chris Hunichen
Counter Claimant: Atonomi LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: David Patrick Peters, Sean Getzwiller, David Cutler, Chase Kornuth and Dennis Samuel Blieden
Case Number: 2:2019cv00615
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
2 Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Oana Constantin filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #225 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Discovery Motions Only As to Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Silke, David)
September 15, 2021 Filing 227 RESPONSE, by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, to #225 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Discovery Motions Only As to Depositions. Oral Argument Requested. (Silke, David)
September 9, 2021 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Angus Ni filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #225 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Discovery Motions Only As to Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ni, Angus)
September 9, 2021 Filing 225 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Discovery Motions Only As to Depositions, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2021, (Ni, Angus)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #223 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines as to Settling Defendants Only. The remaining deadlines in the Case Scheduling Order are vacated as to the Settling Defendants only. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(MW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 223 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines as to Settling Defendants Only, filed by Defendants Woody Benson, LaunchCapital, LLC. Noting Date 9/3/2021, (Mangan, Brendan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 222 RESPONSE to #221 OBJECTIONS by ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendant Atonomi LLC to #218 Report and Recommendations,,. filed by Third Party Defendants Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2021 Noting Date Reset re #221 OBJECTIONS by ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendant Atonomi LLC to #218 Report and Recommendations renoted for 7/23/2021. Objections were noted for 2007 in error. (VE)
July 9, 2021 Filing 221 OBJECTIONS by ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendant Atonomi LLC to #218 Report and Recommendations,,. Noting Date 7/23/2007 07/23/2012 (Silke, David) Modified on 7/20/2021 to correct noting date. (VE)
July 2, 2021 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Angus Ni in Reply on Class Cert filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #197 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Ard, Joel)
July 2, 2021 Filing 219 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, TO RESPONSE to #197 MOTION to Certify Class (Ard, Joel)
June 25, 2021 Filing 218 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Dkt. #171 , should be GRANTED and the Third Party Complaint, Dkt. #82 , and First Amended Counterclaims, Dkt. #81 at 20-28, should be DISMISSED with prejudice. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. If no timely objections are filed, the matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on July 16, 2021. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MW)
June 18, 2021 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Jamie Levitt filed by Defendants Woody Benson, LaunchCapital, LLC re #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mangan, Brendan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 216 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement , by Defendants Woody Benson, LaunchCapital, LLC. (Mangan, Brendan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Angus Ni iso Reply on PA filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ard, Joel)
June 18, 2021 Filing 214 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, TO RESPONSE to #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Ard, Joel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 213 RESPONSE, by Defendant Vaughan Emery, to #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement . (Nelson, Kathleen)
June 14, 2021 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Shannon Armstrong filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Shannon Armstrong)(Armstrong, Shannon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 211 RESPONSE, by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, to #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement . Oral Argument Requested. (Armstrong, Shannon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon Lea Armstrong on behalf of Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Armstrong, Shannon)
June 4, 2021 Filing 209 DECLARATION of OANA CONSTANTIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #197 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Silke, David)
June 4, 2021 Filing 208 RESPONSE, by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, to #197 MOTION to Certify Class . Oral Argument Requested. (Silke, David)
June 3, 2021 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Luiggy Segura filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Ard, Joel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Angus Ni filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Ard, Joel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 205 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Partial Class Settlement , filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/18/2021, (Ard, Joel)
June 2, 2021 Filing 204 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Kathleen A Nelson for Defendant Vaughan Emery from July 26-30, 2021. (Nelson, Kathleen)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying Defendants' #194 Motion to Stay Class Certification Deadlines. The current case scheduling order remains in effect. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(MW)
May 14, 2021 Filing 202 REPLY, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter, TO RESPONSE to #194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines (Silke, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Angus Ni iso Opposition to Stay filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(Ard, Joel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 200 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, to #194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines. (Ard, Joel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Angus Ni filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #197 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-25, #2 Exhibit 26-55)(Ard, Joel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Chris Hunichen filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #197 MOTION to Certify Class (Ard, Joel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 197 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Appendix A) Noting Date 7/2/2021, (Ard, Joel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 196 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines, #195 Declaration, (Silke, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 195 DECLARATION of J. Matthew Donohue filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines (Silke, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 194 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Deadlines, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, M37 Ventures, Inc, Michael Mackey, James Salter. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/14/2021, (Silke, David)
May 3, 2021 Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL JUDGE by Clerk William M McCool. Referral Judge is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler's successor, Magistrate Judge S. Kate Vaughan. (KMP)
April 26, 2021 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Madeline S. Davis on behalf of Defendant David Fragale. (Davis, Madeline)
April 26, 2021 Filing 191 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Madison M. Burke for Defendant David Fragale. (Burke, Madison)
March 31, 2021 Filing 190 NOTICE of Settlement between Hunichen and LaunchCapital and Woody Benson by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
March 9, 2021 Filing 189 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Robert W Norman, Jr for Defendant David Fragale. (Norman, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER re #186 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Haimavathi V Marlier for Defendants Woody Benson and LaunchCapital, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Madison M. Burke on behalf of Defendant David Fragale. (Burke, Madison)
February 22, 2021 Filing 186 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Haimavathi V. Marlier FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Woody Benson, LaunchCapital, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6955753 (Mangan, Brendan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 185 STIPULATION of voluntary dismissal of K. Strickland and L. Paris by parties (Ard, Joel)
February 5, 2021 *** Terminate Parties: Pursuant to the parties' #185 JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re KYLE STRICKLAND AND LUIS PARIS, Plaintiff's individual claims against Kyle Strickland and Luis Paris are dismissed with prejudice, and the alleged class claims against Kyle Strickland and Luis Paris are dismissed without prejudice, with each of the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and litigation costs. (VE)
February 2, 2021 Filing 184 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP FOR DEFENDANT VAUGHAN EMERY ONLY ; filed by Defendant Vaughan Emery. (Silke, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen A Nelson on behalf of Defendant Vaughan Emery. (Nelson, Kathleen)
January 8, 2021 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Joel Ard iso Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Ard, Joel)
January 8, 2021 Filing 181 REPLY, filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, TO RESPONSE to #171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Ard, Joel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 180 DECLARATION of OANA CONSTANTIN IN SUPPORT OF ATONOMI LLCS OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANT AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Defendant Atonomi LLC re #171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Silke, David)
January 4, 2021 Filing 179 RESPONSE, by Defendant Atonomi LLC, to #171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Oral Argument Requested. (Silke, David)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REVISED ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT #86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff Chris Hunichen's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #44 ) is DENIED. re #177 Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT #86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff Chris Hunichen's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #44 ) is DENIED. Respondent's Return Memorandum and Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #5 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
December 10, 2020 Filing 176 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by M37 Ventures, Inc.(Asai, Kristin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Joseph Goodman; William M. Rathbone; Michael Scully; David W Silke; Yuo-Fong Chang Amato and Oana Constantin for Defendant Woody Benson. (Silke, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brendan Thomas Mangan on behalf of Defendant Woody Benson. (Mangan, Brendan)
December 10, 2020 Filing 173 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LaunchCapital, LLC.(Mangan, Brendan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 172 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Ard, Joel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 1/8/2021, (Ard, Joel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 170 PRAECIPE re #160 Answer to Amended Complaint, #168 Answer to Amended Complaint, #161 Answer to Amended Complaint, #167 Answer to Amended Complaint, #165 Answer to Amended Complaint, #166 Answer to Amended Complaint, #158 Answer to Amended Complaint, #164 Answer to Amended Complaint, #159 Answer to Amended Complaint, #162 Answer to Amended Complaint, #163 Answer to Amended Complaint to substitute orginal filings with Attachments 1-11 by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Attachments: #1 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 158 Def. Atonomi LLC's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl. (with Exhibits), #2 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 159 Def. CENTRI Technology, Inc.'s Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #3 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 160 Def. J. Salter's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #4 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 161 Def. K. Strickland's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #5 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 162 Def. L. Paris's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #6 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 163 Def. M. Mackey's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #7 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 164 Def. R. Strickland's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #8 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 165 Def. V. Emery's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #9 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 166 Def. W. Wisehart's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #10 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 167 Def. W. Benson's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl., #11 PRAECIPE - Dkt. 168 Def. D. DeLoach's Answer to Second Am. Class Action Compl.)(Silke, David)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion due by 5/7/2021, Defendant's Opposition Brief due by 6/4/2021, Plaintiffs' Reply Brief due by 7/2/2021, Motions due by 9/9/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/24/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/22/2021, Discovery completed by 11/24/2021, Dispositive motions due by 1/28/2022. (KMP)
November 23, 2020 Filing 168 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Don Deloach.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 167 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Woody Benson.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 166 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Wayne Wisehart.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 165 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Vaughan Emery.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 164 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Rob Strickland.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 163 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Michael Mackey.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 162 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Luis Paris.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 161 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Kyle Strickland.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 160 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by James Salter.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 159 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by CENTRI Technology Inc.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 158 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint Second with JURY DEMAND by Atonomi LLC.(Silke, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 157 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint by David Fragale.(Norman, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER ADOPTING #126 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Claims (Dkt. #96 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
November 20, 2020 Filing 155 REPLY, filed by Defendants LaunchCapital, LLC, M37 Ventures, Inc, TO RESPONSE to #145 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order (Mangan, Brendan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Angus Ni filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #145 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Ard, Joel)
November 18, 2020 Filing 153 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, to #145 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ard, Joel)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #143 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jamie A Levitt for Defendant LaunchCapital, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 13, 2020 Filing 151 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by M37 Ventures, Inc (Donohue, J)
November 13, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J Matthew Donohue on behalf of Defendant M37 Ventures, Inc. (Donohue, J)
November 13, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Mariko Asai on behalf of Defendant M37 Ventures, Inc. (Asai, Kristin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon Lea Armstrong on behalf of Defendant M37 Ventures, Inc. (Armstrong, Shannon)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re #142 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Derek Francis Foran for Defendant LaunchCapital, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 12, 2020 NOTE: Document #145 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Shannon Armstrong is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (MW)
November 12, 2020 Filing 146 DECLARATION of DEREK F. FORAN filed by Defendants LaunchCapital, LLC, M37 Ventures, Inc re #145 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order (Mangan, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order , filed by Defendants LaunchCapital, LLC, M37 Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2020, (Mangan, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 144 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent KLP Enterprises, LLC for LaunchCapital, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by LaunchCapital, LLC (Mangan, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 143 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JAMIE A. LEVITT FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant LaunchCapital, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6734160 (Mangan, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 142 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Derek F. Foran FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant LaunchCapital, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6734134 (Mangan, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brendan Thomas Mangan on behalf of Defendant LaunchCapital, LLC. (Mangan, Brendan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 140 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) LaunchCapital, LLC; M37 Ventures, Inc (MW)
November 9, 2020 Filing 139 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #137 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 138 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #137 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 137 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ard, Joel)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #131 Motion to Amend to Add Defendants. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(MW)
October 30, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Ryan S. Moore for Defendant David Fragale. (Moore, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert W Norman, Jr on behalf of Defendant David Fragale. (Norman, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Filing 133 ANSWER to #82 Third Party Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters.(Ard, Joel)
October 27, 2020 Filing 132 ANSWER to #81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Chris Hunichen.(Ard, Joel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION to Amend to Add Defendants, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint with tracked changes, #2 Amended Complaint clean, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2020, (Ard, Joel)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re #128 Stipulation REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by parties. (KMP)
October 8, 2020 Filing 129 PROTECTIVE ORDER re #127 MOTION for Protective Order by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
October 7, 2020 Filing 128 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by parties (Silke, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants Woody Benson, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Silke, David)
October 6, 2020 Filing 126 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction filed by Chris Hunichen, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Dennis Samuel Blieden. Objections to R&R due by 10/20/2020, Noting Date 10/23/2020. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order)(GB)
September 30, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2020, Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion due by 12/4/2020, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 1/8/2021, Plaintiffs' Reply Brief due by 2/5/2021, Motions due by 4/8/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/28/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 5/27/2021, Discovery completed by 6/25/2021, Dispositive motions due by 7/26/2021. (KMP)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying #117 Motion to Bifurcate signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
September 11, 2020 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Oana Constantin in support of Reply to Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Defendant Atonomi LLC re #117 MOTION to Bifurcate (Silke, David)
September 11, 2020 Filing 121 REPLY, filed by Defendant Atonomi LLC, TO RESPONSE to #117 MOTION to Bifurcate (Silke, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Joel B. Ard filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #117 MOTION to Bifurcate (Ard, Joel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 119 RESPONSE, by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, to #117 MOTION to Bifurcate . (Ard, Joel)
August 27, 2020 Noting Date Set/Reset re defendant Atonomi LLC's #117 Motion to Bifurcate. Per LCR 7(d)(2) and (3), this motion must be noted for 3 Fridays after filing. This motion is therefore RENOTED for 09/11/20.(GB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Oana Constantin in support of Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Defendant Atonomi LLC re #117 MOTION to Bifurcate (Silke, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION to Bifurcate , filed by Defendant Atonomi LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Silke, David)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #115 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oana Constantin for Third Party Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 115 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oana Constantin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6553634 (Silke, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 114 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8-20. (Ard, Joel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 113 REPLY, filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, TO RESPONSE to #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 112 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendant Atonomi LLC, to #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Angus Ni)(Silke, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #110 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph Goodman for Defendants Atonomi LLC,Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 23, 2020 Filing 110 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph W. Goodman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Luis Paris, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, Michael Mackey and James Salter (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-6484038 (Silke, David) Added two defendants to PHV application on 7/24/2020 (DS).
July 21, 2020 Filing 109 Endorsed DECLARATION of David Cutler filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 108 Endorsed DECLARATION of SEAN GETZWILLER filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 107 Endorsed DECLARATION of Chance Kornuth filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 106 Endorsed DECLARATION of David Peters filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William R Restis on behalf of Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters. (Restis, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angus Ni on behalf of Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters. (Ni, Angus)
July 21, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joel B Ard on behalf of Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters. (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 102 DECLARATION of David Peters filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Chance Kornuth filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Sean Getzwiller filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 99 DECLARATION of David Cutler filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Dennis Blieden filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Angus Ni filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Ard, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal and subject matter jurisdiction, filed by Third Party Defendants Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters, Counter Defendant Chris Hunichen, Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/14/2020, (Ard, Joel)
June 30, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE to #90 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart to #86 Report and Recommendations. filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/29/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/12/2020, Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2020. (KMP)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Stipulated Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Third Party Defendants' Response signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Third Party Defendants' answer due 7/20/2020. (KMP)
June 17, 2020 Filing 92 Stipulated MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Third Party Defendants' Response to Atonomi LLC's Third Party Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Noting Date 6/17/2020, (Restis, William)
June 16, 2020 Filing 91 OBJECTIONS re #88 Proposed Order (Unsigned) by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Rathbone, William)
June 16, 2020 Filing 90 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart to #86 Report and Recommendations. Noting Date 7/10/2020, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Rathbone, William)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #87 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Counterclaims and Third Party Claims signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Plaintiff answer due 7/20/2020. (KMP)
June 9, 2020 Filing 88 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ard, Joel)
June 3, 2020 Filing 87 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims and Third Party Claims, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Noting Date 6/3/2020, (Ni, Angus)
June 2, 2020 Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Hunichen. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2020, Noting Date 6/19/2020. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (GB)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #84 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yuo-Fong Chang Amato for ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 84 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yuo-Fong Chang Amato FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for ThirdParty Plaintiff Atonomi LLC, Counter Claimant Atonomi LLC, Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6349945 (Silke, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 83 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to third-party defendant(s) Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters (MW)
May 15, 2020 Filing 82 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Dennis Samuel Blieden, David Cutler, Sean Getzwiller, Chase Kornuth, David Patrick Peters with JURY DEMAND, filed by Atonomi LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Dennis Blieden, #2 Summons for David Cutler, #3 Summons for Sean Getzwiller, #4 Summons for Chase Kornuth, #5 Summons for David Patrick Peters)(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 81 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Chris Hunichen by Atonomi LLC.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 80 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CENTRI Technology Inc.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Luis Paris.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by James Salter.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Michael Mackey.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Woody Benson.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 75 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Wayne Wisehart.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 74 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Don Deloach.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 73 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Rob Strickland.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 72 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Vaughan Emery.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Kyle Strickland.(Rathbone, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 70 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by David Fragale.(Moore, Ryan)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: Defendants Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. Defendants have up to and including May 15, 2020 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (MW)
May 5, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER To File Responsive Pleadings by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rathbone, William)
April 22, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sean C Knowles; Joseph E. Bringman and Zachary E Davison for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Knowles, Sean)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING #40 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss (Dkt. #31 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re #63 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Scully for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re #62 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney William M. Rathbone for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 17, 2020 Filing 63 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Miles (Michael) Scully FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6279046 (Silke, David) Modified Attorney's Name on 4/28/2020 (DS).
April 17, 2020 Filing 62 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William Rathbone FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6278990 (Silke, David)
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #59 Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SEC v. Telegram decision)(Ni, Angus)
February 21, 2020 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Angus Ni in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Z)(Ni, Angus)
February 21, 2020 Filing 59 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, TO RESPONSE to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ni, Angus)
February 19, 2020 Filing 58 PRAECIPE to attach document re #57 Declaration by Defendant David Fragale (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Moore, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #57 Declaration was improperly signed by David Fragale. Signatures must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (MW)
February 18, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION of David Fragale filed by Defendant David Fragale re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Moore, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE, by Defendant David Fragale, to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Moore, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 55 OBJECTIONS re #45 Declaration of Chris Hunichen - Evidentiary Objections, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 54 OBJECTIONS re #46 Declaration of Willam R. Restis - Evidentiary Objections, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Robert A. Strickland filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Michael Mackey filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Grant Fjermedal filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Vaughan Emery filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SAFT, #2 Exhibit B - Investor Questionnaire, #3 Exhibit C - White Paper, #4 Exhibit D - Terms of Token Sale, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Counsel Website)(Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE, by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 48 AMENDMENT to not representing David Fragile to #47 Notice of Appearance, by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Silke, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David W Silke on behalf of Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, David Fragale, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Silke, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of William Restis filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ard, Joel)
January 30, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Chris Hunichen filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ard, Joel)
January 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/21/2020, (Ard, Joel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #41 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart to #40 Report and Recommendations,. filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ni, Angus)
November 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #41 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart to #40 Report and Recommendations,. , by Defendant David Fragale. (Moore, Ryan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart to #40 Report and Recommendations,. Noting Date 11/29/2019, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knowles, Sean)
October 28, 2019 Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss filed by Vaughan Emery, CENTRI Technology Inc, James Salter, Wayne Wisehart, Woody Benson, Don Deloach, Atonomi LLC, Luis Paris, Michael Mackey, Rob Strickland, Kyle Strickland. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2019, Noting Date 11/15/2019. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order)(GB)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Class Certification Briefing signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
October 21, 2019 Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Class Certification Briefing, filed by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen. Noting Date 10/21/2019, (Ard, Joel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart, TO RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss (Knowles, Sean)
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, to #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ard, Joel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss, by Defendant David Fragale. (Moore, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Sean C. Knowles filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss (Knowles, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of James Salter filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss (Knowles, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Vaughan Emery filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss (Knowles, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2019, (Knowles, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Atonomi Defendants' #28 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss. Atonomi Defendants' consolidated Motion to Compel or Dismiss shall be no more than 32 pages. Plaintiff's brief in opposition shall be no more than 32 pages. The Atonomi Defendants' reply brief shall be no more than 16 pages. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Sean C. Knowles filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #28 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs (to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email)(Knowles, Sean)
July 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs (to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/16/2019, (Knowles, Sean)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #22 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines Pending Decision on (forthcoming) Motion to Compel Arbitration signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulated Motion for Temporary Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(KMP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #22 MOTION for Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Compel Arbitration, by Defendant David Fragale.(Moore, Ryan)
July 8, 2019 ***All discovery-related deadlines, including the deadlines for the FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1), and the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan required by FRCP 26(f) and LCR 26(f) are hereby STAYED pursuant to #27 Order. (KMP)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Relief and [Proposed] Order for Temporary Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion for Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines (ECF No. 22), filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. Noting Date 7/2/2019, (Knowles, Sean)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Sean C. Knowles filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart re #22 MOTION for Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 Emails, #4 Exhibit 4 Terms of Token Sale, #5 Exhibit 5 Huuuge Order (from PACER), #6 Exhibit 6 Knudtson Order (from PACER)., #7 Exhibit 7 Order Setting Case Management Conference)(Knowles, Sean)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Relief from Initial Scheduling Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/12/2019, (Knowles, Sean)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler, re: the parties' #20 Stipulated Motion. (TF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Knowles, Sean)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Keith W Miller for Atonomi LLC,Keith W Miller for Defendants Woody Benson,Keith W Miller for CENTRI Technology Inc,Keith W Miller for Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, and Wayne Wisehart. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Keith W. Miller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. Receipt No. 0981-5826751 (Knowles, Sean)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William R Restis for Plaintiff Chris Hunichen, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William R. Restis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822427 (Ard, Joel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(Ard, Joel)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M Veenema for Defendant David Fragale, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Veenema FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant David Fragale (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5814260 (Moore, Ryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan S. Moore on behalf of Defendant David Fragale. (Moore, Ryan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/22/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. (KMP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/18/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
June 11, 2019 Attorney Joseph E. Bringman,Zachary E Davison for Atonomi LLC,Woody Benson,CENTRI Technology Inc,Don Deloach,Vaughan Emery, David Fragale, Michael Mackey,Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland,Wayne Wisehart added; per #6 Notice of Appearance,. (PS) Modified on 6/11/2019 to strike defendant Fragale. (KMP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Knowles, Sean) Modified on 6/11/2019 to reflect filer. (KMP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart (Knowles, Sean) Modified on 6/11/2019 to reflect filer. (KMP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean C Knowles on behalf of Defendants Atonomi LLC, Woody Benson, CENTRI Technology Inc, Don Deloach, Vaughan Emery, Michael Mackey, Luis Paris, James Salter, Kyle Strickland, Rob Strickland, Wayne Wisehart. (Knowles, Sean)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean C Knowles on behalf of Defendant Don Deloach. (Knowles, Sean)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Michael Mackey. (KMP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS on Michael Mackey by Plaintiff Chris Hunichen (Ard, Joel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(SNP)
April 26, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5743751) Attorney Joel B Ard added to party Chris Hunichen(pty:pla), filed by Chris Hunichen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons on Atonomi LLC, #4 Summons on CENTRI Tech., Inc., #5 Summons on Vaughn Emery, #6 Summons on David Fragale, #7 Summons on Rob Strickland, #8 Summons on Kyle Strickland, #9 Summons on Don Deloach, #10 Summons on Wayne Wisehart, #11 Summons on Woody Benson, #12 Summons on Michael Mackey, #13 Summons on James Salter, #14 Summons on Luis Paris)(Ard, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunichen v. Atonomi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mackey
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Paris
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Benson
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Jamie A Levitt
Represented By: Haimavathi V Marlier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Deloach
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Wisehart
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRI Technology Inc
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Salter
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fragale
Represented By: Steven M Veenema
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Represented By: Madison M. Burke
Represented By: Madeline S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Strickland
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Strickland
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughan Emery
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Joseph Goodman
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Represented By: Kathleen A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaunchCapital, LLC
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Derek Francis Foran
Represented By: Jamie A Levitt
Represented By: Haimavathi V Marlier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M37 Ventures, Inc
Represented By: Kristin Mariko Asai
Represented By: Shannon Lea Armstrong
Represented By: J Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chris Hunichen
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Atonomi LLC
Represented By: Joseph E. Bringman
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Keith W Miller
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Michael Scully
Represented By: William M. Rathbone
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Yuo-Fong Chang Amato
Represented By: Oana Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Patrick Peters
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sean Getzwiller
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Cutler
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chase Kornuth
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dennis Samuel Blieden
Represented By: Joel B Ard
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: William R Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?