Peng v. Microsoft Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Yuzhou Peng
Defendant: Lenovo Group, Lenovo and Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00639
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 . Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. CC to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Southern District of New York and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. CC to plaintiff via US Mail.(GT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- A completed Civil Cover Sheet must be filed. Filer has until 5/31/2019 to correct. CC to plaintiff via US Mail.(GT)
May 1, 2019 REFERRING #1 to: Judge Mary Alice Theiler (GT)
May 1, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern, Case Number 1:18-cv-10241.
April 24, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Washington. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Mailed a copy of #12 Order, to Yuzhou Peng Room 101 Unit 1 Building No. 397 Beijing North Road Xinjiang China Urumqy 830000. (vba) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. The transferee court will also decide whether to grant or deny any other pending requests. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/24/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
April 24, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 (6th) AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #10 Amended Complaint against Lenovo Group, Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 (5th) AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #9 Amended Complaint against Lenovo Group, Microsoft Corporation.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 (4th) AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #8 Amended Complaint against Lenovo Group, Microsoft Corporation.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 (3rd) AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #7 Amended Complaint against Lenovo Group, Microsoft Corporation.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 (2nd) AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #4 Amended Complaint against Lenovo, Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING; re: for Permission for Peng Yuzhou to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Yuzhou Peng.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Mr. Peng Yuzhou, dated 12/1/18 re: QUESTION & DOUBT. Document filed by Yuzhou Peng.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT(Amendments of Complaint); re: amending #2 Complaint against Lenovo, Microsoft Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yuzhou Peng. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Yuzhou Peng consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Yuzhou Peng.(sac) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lenovo, Microsoft Corporation. Document filed by Yuzhou Peng.(sac) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Yuzhou Peng.(sac) [Transferred from nysd on 5/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peng v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuzhou Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?