Hofer v. American Airlines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Hofer and Amanda Bickford Hofer
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines Group Inc and American Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00674
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by American Airlines Group Inc, American Airlines Inc.(Jorgensen, Caryn)
June 28, 2019 Per telephonic request of counsel, the deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference is EXTENDED to 7/15/19, and the deadlines for initial disclosures and submission of a Joint Status Report are EXTENDED to 7/29/19. (KD)
June 27, 2019 Attorney Brett Thomas MacIntyre for American Airlines Group Inc, American Airlines Inc added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Airlines Group Inc (Jorgensen, Caryn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc. for American Airlines Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Airlines Inc (Jorgensen, Caryn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen on behalf of Defendants American Airlines Group Inc, American Airlines Inc. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/15/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) American Airlines Group Inc, American Airlines Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (SNP)
May 7, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Amanda Hofer (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Brodkowitz, Alisa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5756333) Attorney Alisa R Brodkowitz added to party Amanda Hofer(pty:pla), filed by Amanda Hofer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brodkowitz, Alisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hofer v. American Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc
Represented By: Brett Thomas MacIntyre
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Brett Thomas MacIntyre
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hofer
Represented By: Alisa R Brodkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bickford Hofer
Represented By: Alisa R Brodkowitz
Represented By: Rachel M Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?