Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. AEI Williams Group Co
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington and Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Defendant: AEI Williams Group Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv00688
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Clerk William M. McCool granting #6 Motion for Default by Carpenters Trusts of Western Washington. Default entered against AEI Williams Group Co. (KD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Maxwell filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington re #6 MOTION for Default (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/11/2019, (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on AEI Williams Group, Co., via Elmore W. Williams, III, its registered agent on 5/11/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/15/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) AEI Williams Group Co (SNP)
May 9, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES against defendant(s) AEI Williams Group Co (Receipt # 0981-5759850) Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), filed by Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action)(Maxwell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. AEI Williams Group Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEI Williams Group Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?