Almli v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Curtis Almli
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00701
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5-8 days. Jury Trial is set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/18/2020, Discovery completed by 5/17/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/31/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/16/2020, Motions in Limine due by 8/17/2020, Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/9/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 9/9/2020 (KERR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-8. (Ryan, Galen)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Ryan, Galen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Ryan, Galen)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/20/2019. (GT)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
May 13, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Galen L. Ryan re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ryan, Galen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 19-2-09873-2; (Receipt # 0981-5762722) Attorney Rory W Leid, III added to party Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B-G, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leid, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almli v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Almli
Represented By: Elizabeth A. LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Galen L Ryan
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?