Hodge et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jim Hodge and Gail Thompson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00706
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Reset Deadline: Having considered Defendant's #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Complaint, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant United States of America has until 8/14/2019 to respond to the Complaint. (VE)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Yael Bortnick on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Complaint, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Bortnick, Yael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jim Hodge, Gail Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Cory)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. The Complaint and Exhibit 1 contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SNP)
May 13, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States of America (Receipt # 0981-5763563), filed by Jim Hodge, Gail Thompson. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Johnson, Cory) Modified on 5/13/2019 (SNP). Modified on 5/13/2019 (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Hodge
Represented By: Cory L Johnson
Represented By: Jason A Harn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Thompson
Represented By: Cory L Johnson
Represented By: Jason A Harn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?