Amazon Digital Services LLC v. Rubio
Petitioner: Amazon Digital Services, LLC and Amazon Digital Services LLC
Respondent: Nilmer Rubio
Case Number: 2:2019cv00712
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT re #5 Order Directing Service. (Receipt # RE256375353US) (AE)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Order Directing Service on Foreign signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Nilmer Rubio via USPS International registered mail)(AE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order Directing Service on Foreign Respondent, filed by Petitioner Amazon Digital Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/29/2019, (Goldmark, John)
May 14, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SNP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Services Inc for Amazon Digital Services, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Digital Services, LLC (Goldmark, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION In Support Of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award of Benjamin J. Robbins re #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Amazon Digital Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robbins, Benjamin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # 0981-5764905), filed by Amazon Digital Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldmark, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon Digital Services LLC v. Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon Digital Services, LLC
Represented By: John Goldmark
Represented By: Benjamin J Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon Digital Services LLC
Represented By: John Goldmark
Represented By: Benjamin J Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nilmer Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?