Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust et al v. CEC Electrical Contracting LLC et al

Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund, Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust and Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Defendant: City of North Bend, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, CEC Electrical Contracting LLC, Skyward Construction, Inc. and Skyward Construction Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated re Plaintiffs' #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case), (TH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eileen Keiffer on behalf of Defendant City of North Bend. (Keiffer, Eileen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on City of North Bend on 5/29/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hillary Evans Graber on behalf of Defendant City of North Bend. (Graber, Hillary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/23/2019 if necessary. (GT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) CEC Electrical Contracting LLC, Skyward Construction Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, and City of North Bend. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
May 16, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement and for Foreclosure of Labor Lien against Public Works Contract and Performance Bond Retention against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5768516) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party National Electrical Benefit Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust, Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust, Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust et al v. CEC Electrical Contracting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Puget Sound Electrical Workers Healthcare Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Electrical Workers 401K Savings Plan Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Bend
Represented By: Eileen Keiffer
Represented By: Hillary Evans Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEC Electrical Contracting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyward Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyward Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?