National Insurance Crime Bureau v. Wagner et al
Plaintiff: National Insurance Crime Bureau
Defendant: Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner, Andrew Wesley Wagner, Leslie Ann Wagner, Joseph Scott Wagner, Dessie Renee Wagner, Leslie Wagner as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner and Leslie Wagner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00730
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Attorney Diane Hunter Cornell terminated)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/24/2019. (AD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura E Kruse on behalf of Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Laura Kruse and Diane Cornell of Betts, Patterson & Mines, P.S., filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Kruse, Laura)
June 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard Lamar Pope, Jr on behalf of Defendant Dessie Renee Wagner. (Pope, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Insurance Crime Bureau (Kruse, Laura)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dessie Renee Wagner on 5/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Joseph Scott Wagner on 5/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner on 5/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Leslie Ann Wagner on 5/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Leslie Wagner as a Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner on 5/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Andrew Wesley Wagner on 5/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Kruse, Laura)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (SNP)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/24/2019. (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner, Leslie Wagner as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner, Andrew Wesley Wagner, Dessie Renee Wagner, Leslie Ann Wagner, Joseph Scott Wagner (Receipt # 0981-5768878), filed by National Insurance Crime Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dessie R. Wagner, #3 Summons Leslie A. Wagner, #4 Summons Estate of Scott L. Wagner, #5 Summons Leslie Wagner as PR of the Estate of Scott Wagner, #6 Summons Joseph S. Wagner, #7 Summons Andrew W. Wagner)(Kruse, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Insurance Crime Bureau v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner
Represented By: Thomas Drake Bigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wesley Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Ann Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dessie Renee Wagner
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Wagner as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Scott Laverne Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Insurance Crime Bureau
Represented By: Laura E Kruse
Represented By: Diane Hunter Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?