Batz et al v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Steven A. Batz, Lindsey L. Batz, Lindsey L Batz and Steven A Batz
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00737
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Length of trial: 4-8 days. Jury Trial is set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13206 before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2019, Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Pltfs' Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/20/2019, Deft's Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/3/2020, Motions due by 1/13/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/17/2020, Discovery completed by 2/13/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2020, Motions in Limine due by 7/13/2020, Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2020, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/Jury instructions due by 8/5/2020. (TF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Lether, Thomas)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/3/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019. (TF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company.(Lether, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/24/2019. (GT)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
May 17, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (GT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10704-9 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5770357), filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit F First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Lether, Thomas) Modified on 5/17/2019 (GT). Modified on 5/20/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batz et al v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Batz
Represented By: Nicholas B. Douglas
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey L. Batz
Represented By: Nicholas B. Douglas
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey L Batz
Represented By: Nicholas B. Douglas
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A Batz
Represented By: Nicholas B. Douglas
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?