Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kimmel, Carter, Roman, Peltz & O'Neill, P.A. and Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA
Defendant: Costco Employee Benefits Program and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00741
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party (Monaco, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA, to #12 MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spadaro, John)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' #15 Motion to Defer Defendants' Motion for Joinder. Pursuant to the Court's June 18, 2019, Order, docket no. #20 , Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for Joinder, docket no. #12 , is due within five (5) business days of the date of this Order, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due within four (4) business days after the filing of Plaintiff's response. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Defendants' Motion for Joinder of Necessary Party Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spadaro, John)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting parties' #18 Stipulated Motion Concerning Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Joinder of Necessary Party. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' #12 Motion for Joinder shall be due five business days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's #15 Motion to Defer; and (2) Defendants' reply on the Motion for Joinder shall be due four business days after filing of Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation, to #15 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Defendants' Motion for Joinder of Necessary Party Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand . (Monaco, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION Concerning Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Joinder of Necessary Party (Dkt.12), filed by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2019, (Monaco, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #12 MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party. Filed by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation. Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Monaco, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER from John S. Spadaro, Esq. to The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly requesting a teleconference on a discrete scheduling issue filed by Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA (Spadaro, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Defendants' #12 Motion for Joinder of Necessary Party Pending Resolution of #14 Motion to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed Order]) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Spadaro, John) Modified on 6/13/2019 to add document links to motions (PM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Spadaro, John)
June 6, 2019 Attorney Erick D Reitz for Costco Employee Benefits Program and Costco Wholesale Corporation added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Rhiannon E. Lockwood filed by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation re #12 MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Monaco, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Party, filed by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Monaco, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily A McClory on behalf of Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation. (McClory, Emily)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John S Spadaro for plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John S. Spadaro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5781894 (Diamond, Maria)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monaco, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation (Monaco, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement ; filed by Plaintiff Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA. (Diamond, Maria)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA (Diamond, Maria)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/22/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/24/2019. (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10456-2; (Receipt # 0981-5770966) Attorney Michael Paul Monaco added to party Costco Employee Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Paul Monaco added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft), filed by Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Monaco, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2019: #3 Complaint) (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Employee Benefits Program
Represented By: Michael Paul Monaco
Represented By: Erick D Reitz
Represented By: Emily A McClory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Michael Paul Monaco
Represented By: Erick D Reitz
Represented By: Emily A McClory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimmel, Carter, Roman, Peltz & O'Neill, P.A.
Represented By: Maria Sophia Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimmel Carter Roman Peltz & O'Neill PA
Represented By: Maria Sophia Diamond
Represented By: John S Spadaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?