American Pacific Mortgage Corporation v. Finance of America Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Pacific Mortgage Corporation and American Pacific Mortgage Corporation a California corporation doing business as Crane Financial Group
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10, Geneva Financial LLC, Finance of America Mortgage LLC, Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay, Paul Matthew Armstrong, Business/Corporate Entities 1-10, Deborah Marie Mercado, Jane/John Does 1-10 and Doe Business/Corporate Entities 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00749
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Paul Matthew Armstrong, Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay, Deborah Marie Mercado.(Butler, Shawn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Adam T Pankratz for Defendant Finance of America Mortgage LLC from 7/5/2010-7/15/2019; 8/06/2019-8/09/2019. (Pankratz, Adam)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Finance of America Holdings LLC for Finance of America Mortgage LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Finance of America Mortgage LLC (Pankratz, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Finance of America Mortgage LLC.(Pankratz, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting parties' #16 Stipulated Motion to Revise Deadline. Deadline for Defendants Mercado, Jennings-Kay, and Armstrong to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. MartinezTheresa L. Fricke. (SWT) Modified on 6/24/2019 to change name of judge who signed order (KB).
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, at the direction of Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT MERCADO'S, JENNINGS-KAY'S, AND ARMSTRONG'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by parties (Butler, Shawn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam T Pankratz on behalf of Defendant Finance of America Mortgage LLC. (Pankratz, Adam)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn Q Butler on behalf of Defendants Paul Matthew Armstrong, Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay, Deborah Marie Mercado. (Butler, Shawn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paul Matthew Armstrong on 5/29/2019, filed by Plaintiff American Pacific Mortgage Corporation. (Calvert, Tyson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Geneva Financial LLC on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff American Pacific Mortgage Corporation. (Calvert, Tyson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Finance of America Mortgage, LLC on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff American Pacific Mortgage Corporation. (Calvert, Tyson)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Pacific Mortgage Corporation (Calvert, Tyson)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Paul Matthew Armstrong (TW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay (TW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Deborah Marie Mercado (TW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Geneva Financial LLC (TW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Finance of America Mortgage LLC (TW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint Finance of America Mortgage LLC by Plaintiff American Pacific Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons Geneva Financial, #2 Summons Deborah Marie Mercado, #3 Summons Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay, #4 Summons Paul Matthew Armstrong)(Calvert, Tyson)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew N Miller on behalf of Plaintiff American Pacific Mortgage Corporation. (Miller, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
May 20, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SNP)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/28/2019. (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5772315), filed by American Pacific Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calvert, Tyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Pacific Mortgage Corporation v. Finance of America Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Pacific Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Newton Miller
Represented By: Tyson L. Calvert
Represented By: Matthew N Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Pacific Mortgage Corporation a California corporation doing business as Crane Financial Group
Represented By: Tyson L. Calvert
Represented By: Matthew N Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finance of America Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Adam T Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Janet Jennings-Kay
Represented By: Samuel D Winninghoff
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Matthew Armstrong
Represented By: Samuel D Winninghoff
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business/Corporate Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Marie Mercado
Represented By: Samuel D Winninghoff
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Business/Corporate Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?