The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts v. Raymond
Plaintiff: The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts
Defendant: Denise Raymond
Case Number: 2:2019cv00777
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/4/2019, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice of Errata Re Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Extend the Dates Set Forth in the Courts Scheduling Order ; filed by Plaintiff The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Buhite, Russell) Modified on 6/20/2019 to add document link to motion to extend (PM).
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Dates Set Forth in the Court's Scheduling Order, filed by Plaintiff The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Buhite, Russell)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts (Buhite, Russell)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/4/2019. (SNP)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Denise Raymond (SNP)
May 23, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts (Buhite, Russell)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Denise Raymond (Receipt # 0981-5777633), filed by The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buhite, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts v. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts
Represented By: Russell S Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?