Patel v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Renisha Hemantkumar Patel
Respondent: US Department of Justice, Carla L Provost, Michele James, US Department of Homeland Security, L Francis Cissna, US Customs and Immigration Enforcement, Anne Arries Corsano, Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, Stephen Langford, Cynthia Munita, Kevin K McAleenan, US Customs and Border Protection, Elizabeth Godfrey and US Citizen and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00841
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Petitioner's #8 Motion for Extension of Time: Petitioner shall file his response to the Governments' #5 motion to dismiss on or before 8/5/2019. The Government may file a reply by 8/9/2019. The Clerk is directed to RE-NOTE the Government's motion to dismiss, Dkt. #5 , for 8/9/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Petitioner Renisha Hemantkumar Patel. Noting Date 7/22/2019, (Nerheim, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Lehman filed by Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Michele James, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Carla L Provost, US Citizen and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Customs and Immigration Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Justice re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return (Lambert, Michelle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Lambert filed by Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Michele James, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Carla L Provost, US Citizen and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Customs and Immigration Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Justice re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Lambert, Michelle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return, filed by Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Michele James, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Carla L Provost, US Citizen and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Customs and Immigration Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Lambert, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, L Francis Cissna, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Michele James, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Carla L Provost, US Citizen and Immigration Services, US Customs and Border Protection, US Customs and Immigration Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Justice. (Lambert, Michelle)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-1 Exhibit B and 1-2 Exhibit C] to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (MET)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL AND DIRECTING SERVICE. Pending the Court's review of the case's merits, petitioner's removal is temporarily STAYED until the motion for stay is resolved. Petitioner's transfer from this judicial district is also temporarily STAYED. On or before 7/3/2019, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. Respondent(s) shall note their return for consideration on 7/26/2019. Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before 7/22/2019, and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) Modified on 6/3/2019 - clerk notified Northwest detention center via phone call and email(SG).
June 3, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SNP)
June 2, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order TRO and Stay of Removal, filed by Petitioner Renisha Hemantkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order on Emergency Motion for TRO and Stay of Removal) Noting Date 6/2/2019, (Nerheim, Mark)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5789606), filed by Renisha Hemantkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Final Order of IJ in Credible Fear Review Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 1st set of docs provided to Petitioner, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2nd set of docs provided to Petitioner when hearing began, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 3rd set of docs provided to Petitioner after the hearing, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Petitioner with translator's certificate, #6 Exhibit Exhbit F - Verification of Attorney and Petitioner for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet JS 44, #8 Emergency Motion for TRO and Stay of Removal, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order on TRO and Stay of Removal)(Nerheim, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Justice
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carla L Provost
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michele James
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Customs and Immigration Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emilia M Bardini
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Langford
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elizabeth Godfrey
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Citizen and Immigration Services
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Renisha Hemantkumar Patel
Represented By: Mark Barrett Nerheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?