Lewis v. Snohomish County Sheriffs et al

Plaintiff: Michael Seville Lewis
Defendant: Kevin Young, Brett Sandstrom, Heidi McAllister, Shannon Dilley, Snohomish County Sheriffs, Kaitlin Geary, Snohomish County Corrections, Kimberly Parker, Rick Hecht and Stephanie Miczek
Case Number: 2:2019cv00870
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff may file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies set out in the Court's prior order (Dkt. #7 ) by 8/5/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Michael Seville Lewis. (SG)
June 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019, (SG)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING SERVICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #6 Complaint filed by Michael Seville Lewis. The Court DECLINES to serve the complaint. The Court grants Mr. Lewis permission to submit an amended complaint to attempt to cure the above-mentioned deficiencies by July 29, 2019. Motion requesting discovery (Dkt. 3) is DENIED without prejudice as premature. (cc: Plaintiff order and complaint form via USPS) (SG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Seville Lewis.(SG)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Snohomish County Corrections Finance Department) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Prison Trust Account Statement, filed by Plaintiff Michael Lewis. (SG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Discovery by Plaintiff Michael Seville Lewis. (SG)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Seville Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Snohomish County Sheriffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Sandstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Miczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Seville Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?