Khrestsov v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Vladimir Khrestsov
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bryan S Wilcox, Warden, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00874
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Julia Sarich filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Forsyth, Kyle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kyle Forsyth filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: I-213, #2 Exhibit B: Father's Ukrainian passport pages, #3 Exhibit C: Criminal Judgment, #4 Exhibit D: Indictment, #5 Exhibit E: Notice to Appear, #6 Exhibit F: Arrest Warrant, #7 Exhibit G: Removal Order, #8 Exhibit H: 2018 Dec. to Cont. Detention, #9 Exhibit I: 2019 Dec. to Cont. Detention)(Forsyth, Kyle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum, filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/2/2019, (Forsyth, Kyle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A. Forsyth on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Forsyth, Kyle)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration.(SG)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, granting #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Petitioner at Northwest Detention center and FPD)(SG)
June 7, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Petitioner Vladimir Khrestsov. (Attachments: #1 Letter of FPD) Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Murphy, Gregory) Modified on 6/7/2019 regenerated notice to US Attorney Habeas (SG).
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5796524), filed by Vladimir Khrestsov.(Murphy, Gregory) Modified on 6/7/2019 US Attorney Habeas added - regenerated notice (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khrestsov v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vladimir Khrestsov
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?