Eckard v. Trenary et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Defendant: Anthony Aston and Ty Trenary
Case Number: 2:2019cv00879
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard. (SG)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. Objections to R&R due by 8/8/2019, Noting Date 8/9/2019. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff on 07/18/19. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(GB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard against defendant(s) Anthony Aston, Ty Trenary with JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Jail via USPS)(ST)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gabriel Eckard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckard v. Trenary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Aston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?