Eckard v. Kane et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Defendant: Kevin Young and Jamie Kane
Case Number: 2:2019cv00882
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Attorney Geoffrey A Enns for Jamie Kane,Geoffrey A Enns for Kevin Young added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kevin Young mailed on 7/1/2019 (Duncan, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jamie Kane mailed on 7/1/2019 (Duncan, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margaret Duncan on behalf of Defendants Jamie Kane, Kevin Young. (Duncan, Margaret)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Jamie Kane; Kevin Young on 7/1/2019. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney's Office via USPS)(ST)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard against defendant(s) Jamie Kane, Kevin Young with JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Corrections via USPS)(ST)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gabriel Eckard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckard v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Young
Represented By: Margaret Duncan
Represented By: Geoffrey A Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Kane
Represented By: Margaret Duncan
Represented By: Geoffrey A Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?