State of Washington v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor Plaintiff: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00884
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David J Kaplan on behalf of Defendants United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler. (Kaplan, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Intervenor COMPLAINT against defendants United States Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler, filed by Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe.(Fiander, Jack)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe. Noting Date 8/9/2019, (Fiander, Jack)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jack Warren Fiander on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe. (Fiander, Jack)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants on 6/12/2019, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lavigne, Ronald)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States EPA and Andrew Wheeler on 6/10/2019, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Lavigne, Ronald)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants United States Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. (GT)
June 7, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5797238) Attorney Ronald L Lavigne, Jr added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Lavigne, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Ronald L Lavigne, Jr
Represented By: Laura J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: David J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: David J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
Represented By: Jack Warren Fiander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?