Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Charanjit Singh
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security, William P Barr, Anne Arries Corsano, Emilia M Bardini, Stephen Langford, L Frances Cissna, United States Department of Justice, Carla L Provost, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Cynthia Munita, United States Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K McAleenan, Michele James, United States Customs and Immigration Enforcement, Elizabeth Godfrey, CIS, DHS and CBP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00890
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice and without costs or fees for any party; lifting the temporary stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by parties (Gugin, Patricia)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting parties' #5 Stipulated Motion to Stay and Abey. The parties shall file a joint status report within 21 days of the resolution of the administrative proceedings related to the credible fear determination. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to stay and hold in abeyance by parties (Gugin, Patricia)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia D Gugin on behalf of Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, L Frances Cissna, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Michele James, Stephen Langford, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Carla L Provost, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Customs and Immigration Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice. (Gugin, Patricia)
June 7, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-5] Exhibit. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (MET)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL AND DIRECTING SERVICE #1 petitioners removal is temporarily STAYED pending briefing and a resolution of petitioners motion for stay. Petitioners transfer from this judicial district is also temporarily STAYED pending resolution of the motion to stay. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. As a part of the return, respondent(s) shall submit a memorandum of authorities in support of their position and state whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary. Also as a part of the return, respondent(s) shall respond to petitioners request for stay. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration. (cc: petitioner) Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal signed by Judge James L. Robart.(CDA) Modified on 6/7/2019 - add language from Order (SG).
June 6, 2019 Judge James L. Robart and Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (CDA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND STAY OF REMOVAL PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5797717), filed by Charanjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Emergency Motion for TRO and Stay of Removal, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Verification for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Certificate of Service, SEALED #5 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lesmez, Jennifer) Modified on 6/6/2019 correct title of main document, Re-generated notice to AUSA (CDA). Modified on 6/7/2019 to seal personal identifiers (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charanjit Singh
Represented By: Jennifer Kim Lesmez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emilia M Bardini
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Langford
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L Frances Cissna
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carla L Provost
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michele James
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Customs and Immigration Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elizabeth Godfrey
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CIS
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CBP
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?