Osborne Construction Company v. HDI Global Specialty SE et al
Plaintiff: Osborne Construction Company
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE, Ohio Security Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00891
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint; (Amended Complaint) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Sotirhos, Maria)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Osborne Construction Company (Riper, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; by HDI Global Specialty SE.(Harris, Eliot)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Silk, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ohio Security Insurance Company, Corporate Parent OHIO CASUALTY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Ohio Security Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Silk, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/23/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 1, 2019 Attorney Maria E Sotirhos added for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, per #7 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Michael Silk on behalf of Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Silk, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Osborne Construction Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riper, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global SE, Corporate Parent Hannover Rueck SE, Other Affiliate International Insurance Company of Hannover SE for HDI Global Specialty SE. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HDI Global Specialty SE (Harris, Eliot)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Osborne Construction Company (Riper, John)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Osborne Construction Company and HDI Global Specialty SE must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/17/2019. (GT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
June 10, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-12280-3-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5798683), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Harris, Eliot) Modified on 6/10/2019 (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne Construction Company v. HDI Global Specialty SE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Nicholas R Major
Represented By: Eliot M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria E Sotirhos
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria E Sotirhos
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborne Construction Company
Represented By: John S Riper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?