D.R. et al v. Northshore School District
Plaintiff: M.R. and D.R.
Defendant: Northshore School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00918
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #12 Stipulated Motion to Establish a Briefing Schedule. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Establish a Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendant Northshore School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2019, (Chavez, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 19-cv-00034, by Plaintiffs D.R., M.R.. (Shapow, Angela)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah C Johnson on behalf of Defendant Northshore School District. (Johnson, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles A Chavez on behalf of Defendant Northshore School District. (Chavez, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Northshore School District, filed by D.R., M.R..(Shapow, Angela)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs D.R., M.R. (Shapow, Angela)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Defendants (Shapow, Angela)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Northshore School District (ST)
June 13, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs D.R., M.R. (Shapow, Angela)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5805031), filed by M.R., D.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shapow, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R. et al v. Northshore School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northshore School District
Represented By: Charles A Chavez
Represented By: Sarah C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.
Represented By: Angela M Shapow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R.
Represented By: Angela M Shapow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?