Brandt v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Judith Brandt
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00920
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Naomi Arin on behalf of Plaintiff Judith Brandt. (Arin, Naomi)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/16/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Minute Order : Modified docket text to strike through language regarding magistrate judge no longer assigned to case (SWT)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing the reference of all pretrial matters to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case.) Modified docket text on 7/10/2019 (SWT).
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Worden, Gregory)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Worden, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Worden, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Max J Meyers. Filed by Plaintiff Judith Brandt. (Meyers, Max) Modified address on 6/19/2019 (DS).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/24/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/21/2019. (SNP)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
June 14, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (SNP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11564-5 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5805366), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Worden, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory S Worden
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Brandt
Represented By: Max J Meyers
Represented By: Naomi Arin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?