Hernandez-Rodriguez v Barr et al
Petitioner: Javier Hernandez-Rodriguez
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00931
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental DECLARATION of Miguel Miranda filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Respondents' Return (Johnson, Kristin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY, filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Respondents' Return (Johnson, Kristin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kristin B. Johnson filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Respondents' Return (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Kristin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Respondents' Return, filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miguel Miranda) Noting Date 8/9/2019, (Johnson, Kristin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Berger Johnson on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Johnson, Kristin)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration. (cc: petitioner) (SG)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Petition via USPS)(SG)
June 17, 2019 Judge James L. Robart and Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Petitioner Javier Hernandez-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Letter of FPD) Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Murphy, Gregory)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5808360), filed by Javier Hernandez-Rodriguez.(Murphy, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez-Rodriguez v Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Hernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?