Chen v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Yunzhong Chen
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00934
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Yunzhong Chen returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #5 Order Directing Service. (MW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bryan S Wilcox. (Morehead, Sarah)
June 24, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Parties' #6 Stipulation of Dismissal (MW)
June 24, 2019 NOTE re: Document #6 . Appearance of attorney Sarah Morehead is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. This can be corrected by filing a notice of appearance. (SWT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Writ of Habeas Corpus by parties (Murphy, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration. (cc: petitioner)(SG)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(SG) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
June 17, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Petitioner Yunzhong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Letter of FPD) Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Murphy, Gregory)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5808698), filed by Yunzhong Chen.(Murphy, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yunzhong Chen
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?