Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Prabhjit Singh
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano, Stephen Langford, Emilia M. Bardini, Cynthia Munita, William P. Barrett, Mark Koumans, Elizabeth Godfrey, Kevin K. McAleenan, Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr and Kevin K McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00940
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 0. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Forsyth, Kyle)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Parties' #4 Stipulation to Stay and Hold in Abeyance: This action is STAYED pending resolution of the administrative proceedings related to USCIS's de novo review of the negative credible fear finding of petitioner; The parties shall file a joint status report within 21 days of the resolution of the administrative proceedings related to the credible fear determination. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (MW)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A. Forsyth on behalf of Respondents Emilia M Bardini, William P Barr, Anne Arries Corsano, Elizabeth Godfrey, Mark Koumans, Stephen Langford, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita. (Forsyth, Kyle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay and Hold in Abeyance by parties (Forsyth, Kyle)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Richard A. Jones granting #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Having reviewed Petitioner's submissions, the Court ORDERS: (1) In light of the immediacy of irreparable harm to Petitioner pending the Court's review of the cases merits, Petitioner's removal is temporarily STAYED until the motion for stay is resolved. Petitioner's transfer from this judicial district is also temporarily STAYED pending resolution of the motion to stay. The Court expresses no views at this time as to the merits of Petitioner's habeas petition or request for stay. (2) If not previously accomplished, electronic posting of this Order and Petitioner's 2241 habeas petition shall effect service upon the United States Attorney of the petition and all supporting documents, including the emergency request for stay of removal. Service upon the United States Attorney is deemed to be service upon the named respondents. (3) On or before July 17, 2019, Respondent(s) shall file a return and status report (RSR) as provided in 28 U.S.C. 2243, explaining why the Court should not grant petitioner's petition. As a part of such return, Respondent(s) shall submit a memorandum of authorities in support of their position and state whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary. Also as a part of the return, Respondent(s) shall respond to petitioners request for stay. (4) In accordance with LCR 7(d), Respondent(s) shall note their return for consideration on August 9, 2019. Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before August 5, 2019, and Respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date. (GT) Modified on 6/18/2019: Copy of order emailed to ICE as well as phone call to petitioner's counsel and ICE informing them of stay of deportation on 06/17/19 (GT).
June 17, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Prabhjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2019, (Boyd, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2241 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5810705) Attorney Adam Boyd added to party Prabhjit Singh(pty:pla), filed by Prabhjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Order of IJ in Credible Fear Review Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - Documents Provided to Petitioner prior to CFI Review, #3 Exhibit C - Documents Provided to Petitioner at CFI Review Hearing, #4 Exhibit D- Declaration of Petitioner, #5 Exhibit F- Verification of Petition, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Adam) Modified on 6/18/2019 to correct document title(GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Langford
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emilia M. Bardini
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barrett
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Koumans
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elizabeth Godfrey
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Emilia M Bardini
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prabhjit Singh
Represented By: Adam Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?