Stecca et al v. Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Maria Stecca and Gerardo Stecca
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. and Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00942
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/16/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Minute Order: Modified docket text to strike through language regarding magistrate judge no longer assigned to case (SWT)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing reference of all pretrial matters to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case.) Modified docket text on 7/10/2019 (SWT).
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Fred Meyer Stores Inc.(Khachatourians, Natasha)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT TO THE COURT by Plaintiffs Gerardo Stecca, Maria Stecca (Sturdevant, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co., Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc. for Fred Meyer Stores Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fred Meyer Stores Inc (Khachatourians, Natasha)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/25/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Shawna M. Lydon; Natasha A. Khachatourians, on behalf of Fred Meyer Stores, Inc., on 6/6/2019. (Sturdevant, James)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/25/2019. (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from Whatcom County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (SNP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal and Declaration of Natasha A. Khachatourians ISO the same by Defendant Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Khachatourians, Natasha)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whatcom County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00965-37; (Receipt # 0981-5811094), filed by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khachatourians, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stecca et al v. Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Stecca
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Stecca
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Shawna M Lydon
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Represented By: Shawna M Lydon
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?