Murinko v. Strange et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Murinko and Disability Rights Washington
Defendant: Cheryl Strange and Sue Birch
Case Number: 2:2019cv00943
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange.(Krieger, Kathryn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Shawn Murinko.(Eaton, Sarah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Nissa Ann Iversen for Defendants Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange from 08/09/2019-09/02/2019. (Iversen, Nissa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Susan Birch on 6/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. (Eaton, Sarah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cheryl Strange on 6/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. (Eaton, Sarah)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/22/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange.(Iversen, Nissa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. (Eaton, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Eaton, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Attorney Kathryn Krieger added for Sue Birch and Cheryl Strange per #11 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to File Papers Under Seal. The Excerpted hospital records (Murinko Decl., Ex. A and C), Dkts. #6 #7 , and Plaintiff's Person Centered Service Plan (Eaton Decl. Ex. B). Dkt. #9 , shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nissa Ann Iversen on behalf of Defendants Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange. (Iversen, Nissa)
June 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (CDA)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 PRAECIPE re #8 Declaration of Sarah Eaton by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration)(Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF SARAH EATON by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko re #3 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #8 Declaration (Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of SARAH EATON filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF SHAWN MURINKO by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko re #3 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #5 Declaration (Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF SHAWN MURINKO by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko re #3 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #5 Declaration (Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of SHAWN MURINKO filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/12/2019, (Eaton, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff Shawn Murinko. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/12/2019, (Eaton, Sarah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
June 18, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sue Birch, Cheryl Strange (Receipt # 0981-5811169), filed by Shawn Murinko. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DSHS, #3 Summons HCA)(Eaton, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murinko v. Strange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Nissa Ann Iversen
Represented By: Kathryn Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Birch
Represented By: Nissa Ann Iversen
Represented By: Kathryn Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Murinko
Represented By: Sarah Eaton
Represented By: Andrew Sean Biviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?