Ruiz v. Snohomish County et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Brian Ruiz
Defendant: Snohomish County Risk Manager, Snohomish County Sheriff's Office, Corrections Bureau and Snohomish County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00946
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #5 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Raymond Brian Ruiz (ST)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Raymond Brian Ruiz (SG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson re #5 Complaint filed by Raymond Brian Ruiz Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2019, (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (SG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Brian Ruiz.(SG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Snohomish County Jail) by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SG) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Raymond Brian Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 prison trust account statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Snohomish County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Risk Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Brian Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?