Dynamic Data Technologies LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies LLC
Defendant: HTC America Inc and HTC Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00947
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 65 REPORT on the determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SWT)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' #62 Stipulation. Plaintiff consents to dismissal with prejudice of all of its claims against Defendants in this suit. Plaintiff and Defendants shall each bear their own attorney fees and costs incurred in connection with this action. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (Wechkin, Robin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS HTC CORPORATION AND HTC AMERICA INC. by parties (Wechkin, Robin)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/26/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 59 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 58 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Southern District of New York and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (PS)
June 18, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 57 Case transferred in from the Southern District of New York, Case Number 1:18-cv-10180.
June 11, 2019 Filing 56 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/11/19 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
June 11, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Washington (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. For the reasons set forth above, HTC's motion to transfer venue to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 36 and to transfer this case to the Western District of Washington. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/9/2019) (mro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 10, 2019 is adjourned to July 10, 2019 at 4:15 p.m. The proposed case management plan and joint letter described in the Court's February 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 17, are due no later than July 3, 2019. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond is extended to July 10, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 52. HTC America, Inc. answer due 7/10/2019; HTC Corporation answer due 7/10/2019. ( Initial Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 04:15 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/29/2019) (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 53 Objection re: #52 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial Pretrial) scheduled for June 10, 2019 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/28/2019. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/28/2019. . Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 52 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial Pretrial) scheduled for June 10, 2019 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/28/2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/28/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 20, 2019 is adjourned to June 10, 2019 at 4:45 p.m. The proposed case management plan and joint letter described in the Court's February 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 17, are due no later than June 3, 2019. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond is extended to June 10, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 49. SO ORDERED. (HTC America, Inc. answer due 6/10/2019; HTC Corporation answer due 6/10/2019.)(Initial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 04:45 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/8/2019) (anc) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 50 Objection re: #49 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled on May 20, 2019 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/06/2019. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/06/2019. . Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 49 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled on May 20, 2019 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/06/2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 05/06/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of David Wiggins in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington.. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Curt Holbreich in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington.. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit P, #9 Exhibit Q, #10 Exhibit R, #11 Exhibit S, #12 Exhibit T, #13 Exhibit U, #14 Exhibit V, #15 Exhibit W)(Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington. . Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington. . Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel P. Hipskind In Support of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC's Opposition to HTC's Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #34 Amended Complaint. Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended to May 10, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 43. SO ORDERED. (HTC America, Inc. answer due 5/10/2019; HTC Corporation answer due 5/10/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/30/2019) (rro) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 03/29/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #41 Letter filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: In light of HTC's pending motion to transfer this case to the Western District of Washington, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 15, 2019 is adjourned to May 20, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's February 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 17, are due no later than May 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/26/2019) ( Initial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.)(ks) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 03/25/2019 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Martin E. Gilmore is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Martin E. Gilmore from the list of counsel in this case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 35. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Martin Edward Gilmore, III terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/25/2019) (anc) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Philip Wilging in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington.. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Curt Holbreich in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington.. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington. . Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Martin E. Gilmore to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Gilmore, Martin) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 34 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '073 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '257 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - '054 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - '918 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 -689 Patent, #6 Exhibit 6 - '177 Patent, #7 Exhibit 7 - '039 Patent, #8 Exhibit 8 - '112 Patent, #9 Exhibit 9 - '688 Patent, #10 Exhibit 10 - '529 Patent, #11 Exhibit 11 - '450 Patent)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/1/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 3/1/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Michael J. Bettinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the teleconference held on March 1, 2019, Defendants request for leave to file a motion to transfer venue is granted. Defendants brief is due no later than March 22, 2019. Plaintiffs opposition, if any, is due no later than two weeks following service of Defendants motion. Defendants reply, if any, is due no later than one week following Plaintiffs opposition. For the reasons also stated on the record, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint. The scope of Plaintiffs amendments is limited to those designed to address the deficiencies Defendant raises in its letter brief in support of a pre-motion conference, Dkt. No. 26, and is due no later than March 22, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on March 4, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2019. (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America, Inc.. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Simpson, Todd) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Todd Matthew Simpson to RE-FILE Document #24 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 02/26/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to transfer venue and motion to dismiss on March 1, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 26. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference is granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 12, 2019 is adjourned to April 15, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's February 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 17, are due no later than April 8, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 25. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2019) (ne) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 02/26/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 02/26/2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael J. Bettinger dated 02/26/2019. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Simpson, Todd) Modified on 2/28/2019 (ldi). [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Matthew Simpson on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Simpson, Todd) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Saurabh Prabhakar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Curt Holbreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Saurabh Prabhakar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Saurabh Prabhakar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Saurabh Prabhakar and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prabhakar, Saurabh) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Curt Holbreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392404. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #18 MOTION for Michael J. Bettinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392323. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Curt Holbreich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392404. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Curt Holbreich and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holbreich, Curt) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Michael J. Bettinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16392323. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Bettinger with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/13/2019) (anc) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: HTC America, Inc. answer due 2/26/2019; HTC Corporation answer due 2/26/2019. (kv) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ENDORSED granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' December 4, 2018 application for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 15, is granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 26, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/10/2018) (kv) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Martin E. Gilmore dated December 4, 2018. Document filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Gilmore, Martin) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Edward Gilmore, III on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Gilmore, Martin) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Dorian S. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Dorian S. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15976501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Dorian S. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15976501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Berger, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Dorian) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND AND WAIVER OF SERVICE denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's November 27, 2018 request to extend Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 10, is denied without prejudice. Defendants may renew this application through counsel after counsel has appeared in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/28/2018) (anc) Modified on 11/28/2018 (anc). [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. HTC America, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Service was accepted by Phillip Morado - Agent. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Daniel Paul Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Daniel Paul Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15874456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Daniel Paul Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15874456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 5, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Daniel Paul Hipskind re: Document No. #3 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney; the pdf attached is not correct. Only one AO 120 form may be attached with a 'rider' included listing all of the registration numbers.. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies.. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HTC America, Inc.. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Paul Hipskind. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC.(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HTC America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hipskind, Daniel) Modified on 11/5/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15848783)Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from nysd on 6/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Data Technologies LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies LLC
Represented By: Dorian S. Berger
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Saurabh Prabhakar
Represented By: Martin Edward Gilmore, III
Represented By: Todd M Simpson
Represented By: Curt Holbreich
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Saurabh Prabhakar
Represented By: Martin Edward Gilmore, III
Represented By: Todd M Simpson
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Curt Holbreich
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?