Butler v. Canty-Basham
Plaintiff: Amelia Butler
Defendant: Canty-Basham
Case Number: 2:2019cv00965
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. The Court ORDERS that C19-964RSM and C19-965RSM shall be CONSOLIDATED. All future documents shall be filed only under the consolidated cause number C19-964RSM and shall not be filed under other cause numbers. As to pending motions in Butler v. Canty-Basham, Case No. C19-965RSM (W.D. Wash.): Plaintiff's #5 MOTION to Issue Summons is denied as moot; Plaintiff's #20 Motion for both cases if Consolidated to retain their independent character and Response to judge's order to show cause" is denied as moot; Plaintiff's #21 Notice and Conflict of interest and Motion to remove defense counsel is denied as moot; Plaintiff's #22 MOTION to Amend complaint is granted in part. Within forty-five (45) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a single, consolidated complaint setting forth all of Plaintiff's claims against both Defendants. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Canty-Basham (Smith, Elisha)
July 31, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #18 MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint, filed by Amelia Butler (Received by mail). (Duplicate received in person on 7/31/2019. See Dkt. #22 ) (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit) Noted by Clerk 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE and Conflict of Interest and MOTION to Remove John H. Wiegensten, Elsiha S. Smith, Heller Wiegenstein PLLC and Fire Casualty Claim Specialist from this Case, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Both Cases if Consolidated to Retain Their Independent Character and RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Amelia Butler re #18 MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint and all documents (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit) Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to show cause within fourteen (14) days as to: (1) why this case is or is not related to Case No. C19-964RSM and (2) why this case should or should not be consolidated with Case No. C19- 964RSM. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour no longer assigned to case. All future filings in this case should reflect the change in the case number as follows: C19-0965-RSM. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Complaint and exhibit to Melody Canty-Basham on 7/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. (PM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION to #12 Notice of Related Case by Plaintiff Amelia Butler (SWT)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Amelia Butler (SWT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-CV-00964, by Defendant Canty-Basham. (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Canty-Basham re #10 Notice of Appearance (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elisha Sandra Smith on behalf of Defendant Canty-Basham. (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 NOTE re: Document #8 . Appearance of attorney Elisha S. Smith is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Canty-Basham re #8 Notice of Appearance (Wiegenstein, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Henry Wiegenstein on behalf of Defendant Canty-Basham. (Wiegenstein, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against defendant Canty-Basham with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Amelia Butler. (TH)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Issue Summons, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 7/12/2019, (TH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Amelia Butler. (TH)
June 21, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (GT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 7/22/2019 to correct (GT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Amelia Butler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Canty-Basham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canty-Basham
Represented By: Elisha Sandra Smith
Represented By: John Henry Wiegenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?