McClure and Sons Inc v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: McClure and Sons, Inc. and McClure and Sons Inc
Defendant: Kraig Anderson, KCM, LLC, LIG Forming and Shoring, LLC, Tara R Barker, LIG Forming and Shoring LLC, KCM LLC and Tara R Anderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00969
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(TW)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS LIG Forming and Shoring, LLC by Plaintiff McClure and Sons Inc (Elston, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS KCM, LLC by Plaintiff McClure and Sons Inc (Elston, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Tara Barker by Plaintiff McClure and Sons Inc (Elston, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Kraig Anderson by Plaintiff McClure and Sons Inc (Elston, Douglas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McClure and Sons Inc (Elston, Douglas)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, McClure and Sons Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/1/2019. (GT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #3 Praecipe for a Summons. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
June 24, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff McClure and Sons, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barker, #2 Summons KCM, #3 LIG)(Elston, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff McClure and Sons, Inc.. (Elston, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5817872) Attorney Douglas W. Elston added to party McClure and Sons, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by McClure and Sons, Inc..(Elston, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure and Sons Inc v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraig Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIG Forming and Shoring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara R Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIG Forming and Shoring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McClure and Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W. Elston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McClure and Sons Inc
Represented By: Douglas W. Elston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?