Washington Federal Bank v. Garold et al
Plaintiff: Washington Federal Bank
Defendant: Lori Herbst and Mark Garold
Case Number: 2:2019cv00995
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Joshua D. Stadtler, on behalf of Mark Gerold, on 8/23/2019. (Muchinsky, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Muchinsky, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Washington Federal Bank.(Muchinsky, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/7/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Washington Federal, Inc. for Washington Federal Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington Federal Bank (Muchinsky, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Mark Garold and Lori Herbst. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
June 27, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Washington Federal Bank must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/5/2019. (GT)
June 27, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5823116) Attorney Brian Michael Muchinsky added to party Washington Federal Bank(pty:pla), filed by Washington Federal Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mark Garold, #3 Summons Lori Herbst)(Muchinsky, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Federal Bank v. Garold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Federal Bank
Represented By: Nafees Uddin
Represented By: Brian Michael Muchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?