Bair v. Snohomish County et al
Plaintiff: CHERYL BAIR
Defendant: DOES I-X, SNOHOMISH COUNTY and BERLIN KOFOED
Case Number: 2:2019cv00998
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint for Damages by Berlin Kofoed, Snohomish County.(Bosch, Katherine)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 4 DAY - Jury Trial is set for 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/30/2020, Discovery completed by 4/29/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020, Motions in Limine due by 9/21/2020, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 9/28/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Bair.(Parker, Darryl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Cheryl Bair.(Parker, Darryl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Darryl Parker for Plaintiff Cheryl Bair from December 18, 2019 to December 25, 2019. (Parker, Darryl)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/22/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Cheryl Bair (Parker, Darryl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Berlin Kofoed mailed on 6/27/2019 (Bosch, Katherine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
June 27, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Berlin Kofoed, Snohomish County (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice to Snohomish County Superior Court of Removal)(Bosch, Katherine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendants Berlin Kofoed, Snohomish County. (Bosch, Katherine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Defendants Berlin Kofoed, Snohomish County (Bosch, Katherine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19-2-04686-31; (Receipt # 0981-5823511), filed by Snohomish County, Berlin Kofoed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bosch, Katherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #2 Complaint) (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bair v. Snohomish County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNOHOMISH COUNTY
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Bridget E Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERLIN KOFOED
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Represented By: Bridget E Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL BAIR
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?