Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Amber Seattle LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, The Music Force, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, ECAF Music, Fox Film Music Corporation, Rondor Music International, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Hip City Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc and Broadcast Music Inc
Defendant: Amber Seattle LLC, Ryan Lewis, Amber Restaurant, Henry Youn and Amber
Case Number: 2:2019cv01004
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Henry Youn(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Ryan Lewis(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro added to party Amber(pty:dft) by Henry Youn, Ryan Lewis, Amber.(Cavagnaro, Gregory)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/27/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory P Cavagnaro on behalf of Defendants Amber Seattle LLC, Ryan Lewis, Plaintiff Henry Youn. (Cavagnaro, Gregory) Modified on 8/20/2019 (GMR).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Gregory P. Cavagnaro, on behalf of Henry Youn, on 8/16/2019. (Cavagnaro, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amber Seattle LLC dba Amber aka Amber Restaurant, Bar & Lounge on 8/2/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, ECAF Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, The Music Force. (Hill, Alexander)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ryan Lewis on 8/2/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, ECAF Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, The Music Force. (Hill, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc; Corporate Parent Capital EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International Inc; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music Inc; Corporate Parent Fox Music, Inc. for Fox Film Music Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Fox Film Music Corporation, Hip City Music Inc, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc (Podwill, Loren)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Amber Seattle LLC, Ryan Lewis, and Henry Youn. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 7/5/2019. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5825012) Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Beechwood Music Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party ECAF Music(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Fox Film Music Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Hifrost Publishing(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Hip City Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Loren D Podwill added to party The Music Force(pty:pla), filed by Hifrost Publishing, ECAF Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., The Music Force, Fox Film Music Corporation, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Hip City Music Inc., Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Podwill, Loren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Amber Seattle LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Seattle LLC
Represented By: Gregory P Cavagnaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lewis
Represented By: Gregory P Cavagnaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Restaurant
Represented By: Gregory P Cavagnaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Youn
Represented By: Gregory P Cavagnaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber
Represented By: Gregory P Cavagnaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindseyanne Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hifrost Publishing
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECAF Music
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Film Music Corporation
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindseyanne Music Co Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Alexander H Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?