Harbers v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Harbers
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Eddie Bauer LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv01012
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplemental Authority)(Shewmake, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul Karl Lukacs for Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul Karl Lukacs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5873369 (Corrington, Che)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Corrington, Che)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Meegan Brooks In Support of Defendant's Reply filed by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Levy, Marc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Levy, Marc)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 11/24/2019; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 12/24/2019. (AD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/20/2019. (AD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jennifer Harbers filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Corrington, Che)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Che Corrington filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Corrington, Che)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Benjamin Bannister filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Corrington, Che)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers, to #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Corrington, Che)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Over-Length Brief) Noting Date 7/16/2019, (Corrington, Che)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to case. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case number CV19-1012JLR. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC for JUDICIAL NOTICE re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Levy, Marc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of JAMES McMURDO filed by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC re #13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Levy, Marc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Levy, Marc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony Anscombe for defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Meegan Brooks for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony Anscombe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5831552 (Levy, Marc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meegan Brooks FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5831548 (Levy, Marc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephanie Sheridan for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephanie Sheridan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5830785 (Levy, Marc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shewmake, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Eddie Bauer Parent LLC, Corporate Parent Everest Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent PSEB LLC, Corporate Parent PSEB Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Everest Topco LLC for Eddie Bauer LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Eddie Bauer LLC (Levy, Marc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-00968-JLR, by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC. (Levy, Marc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Eddie Bauer LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/8/2019. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Washington for King County, case number 19-2-14167-1-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5827095), filed by Eddie Bauer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit A)(Levy, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbers v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bauer LLC
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: Stephanie Sheridan
Represented By: Meegan Brooks
Represented By: Anthony Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Harbers
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Paul Karl Lukacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?