Ali et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hassan Ali and Deka Yusuf
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01015
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures and Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. The Deadline for Initial Disclosures to be extended to 9/6/2019. The deadline for the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan to be extended to 9/13/19. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Hassan Ali, Deka Yusuf, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand To State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wells, Veronica)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures and Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, filed by Plaintiffs Hassan Ali, Deka Yusuf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Wells Dec ISO Motion to Extend) Noting Date 7/31/2019, (Wells, Veronica)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Michael Unruh filed by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Remand To State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lether, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE, by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company, to #6 MOTION to Remand To State Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lether, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand To State Court, filed by Plaintiffs Hassan Ali, Deka Yusuf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/2/2019, (Wells, Veronica)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Lether, Thomas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/7/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Progressive Direct Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/9/2019. (GT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 2, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-14463-7 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5828372), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Ali
Represented By: Veronica A Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deka Yusuf
Represented By: Veronica A Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?