Homesite Insurance Company v. Zajac et al
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company
Defendant: Janet Feldmann, William Feldmann, Susan P Zajac, Joseph M Zajac, The Joseph M. Zajac and Susan P. Zajac Trust Dated April 12, 2017 and The Joseph M Zajac and Susan P Zajac Trust Dated April 12 2017
Case Number: 2:2019cv01034
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Attorney David M Von Beck,Jonathan Xu Shi for Susan P Zajac added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (ELS)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Dewitt McBride on behalf of Defendants The Joseph M Zajac and Susan P Zajac Trust Dated April 12 2017, Joseph M Zajac. (McBride, James)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per telephonic request of counsel, the deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference is EXTENDED to 9/13/2019, and the deadlines for initial disclosures and submission of a Joint Status Report are EXTENDED to 9/27/2019. (KD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jordan M Hecker for Defendants Janet Feldmann, William Feldmann. (Wakefield, Stephan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephan Douglas Wakefield on behalf of Defendants Janet Feldmann, William Feldmann. (Wakefield, Stephan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie J Comstock on behalf of Defendant Susan P Zajac. (Comstock, Katie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Susan P. Zajac; and The Joseph M. Zajac and Susan P. Zajac Trust Dated April 12, 2017 on 8/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Homesite Insurance Company. (Harris, Eliot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Joseph M. Zajac; and The Joseph M. Zajac and Susan P. Zajac Trust Dated April 12, 2017 on 8/6/2019, filed by Plaintiff Homesite Insurance Company. (Harris, Eliot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Susan P. Zajac; and The Joseph M. Zajac and Susan P. Zajac Trust Dated April 12, 2017 on 8/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Homesite Insurance Company. (Harris, Eliot)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #5 Answer to Complaint Notice of Appearance : Modified docket text to clarify description of document. (SWT)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant William Feldmann mailed on 7/9/2019 (Harris, Eliot)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Janet Feldmann mailed on 7/9/2019 (Harris, Eliot)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; Notice of Appearance Attorney Jordan M Hecker added to party Janet Feldmann(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan M Hecker added to party William Feldmann(pty:dft) by Janet Feldmann, William Feldmann.(Hecker, Jordan) Modified docket text on 7/26/2019 to clarify description of document (SWT).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Janet Feldmann, William Feldmann, The Joseph M Zajac and Susan P Zajac Trust Dated April 12 2017, Joseph M Zajac, and Susan P Zajac. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GT)
July 8, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Corporate Parent AMFAM, Inc., Corporate Parent Homesite Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent Homesite Securities Company LLC, Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings, Inc. for Homesite Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Harris, Eliot)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5832947), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Joseph Zajac, #8 Summons Susan Zajac, #9 Summons Zajac Trust, #10 Summons Zajac Trust, #11 Summons William & Janet Feldmann)(Harris, Eliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Insurance Company v. Zajac et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Feldmann
Represented By: Jordan M Hecker
Represented By: Stephan Douglas Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Feldmann
Represented By: Jordan M Hecker
Represented By: Stephan Douglas Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan P Zajac
Represented By: Katie J Comstock
Represented By: David M Von Beck
Represented By: Jonathan X Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Zajac
Represented By: James Dewitt McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joseph M. Zajac and Susan P. Zajac Trust Dated April 12, 2017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joseph M Zajac and Susan P Zajac Trust Dated April 12 2017
Represented By: James Dewitt McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin J Varriano
Represented By: Eliot M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?