Sanchez v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Leyanis Pila Sanchez
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security, James McHenry, Kevin McAleenan, Steven Langford, Elizabeth Godfrey and Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 2:2019cv01039
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting parties' #8 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. This matter is dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to either party. The temporary stay is hereby lifted. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss, filed by Respondents Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 7/18/2019, (Morehead, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Respondents Executive Office for Immigration Review, Elizabeth Godfrey, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Morehead, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL AND DIRECTING SERVICE granting #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. Electronic posting of this Order and Petitioners 2241 habeas petition shall effect service upon the United States Attorney of the petition and all supporting documents, including the emergency request for stay of removal. Service upon the United States Attorney is deemed to be service upon the named respondents. By August 7, 2019, Respondent(s) shall file a return and status report (RSR) as provided in 28 U.S.C. 2243, explaining why the Court should not grant Petitioners petition. In accordance with LCR 7(d), Respondent(s) shall note their return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before the Monday immediately preceding the noting date, and Respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date.(SG) Modified on 7/8/2019 Clerk contacted the Group list for ICE and emailed. Several attempts to contact an agent at ICE. Also left a message with counsel that the order has been signed(SG).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Petitioner Leyanis Pila Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Leila Kang) Noting Date 7/8/2019, (Korthuis, Aaron)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit D by Petitioner Leyanis Pila Sanchez (Kang, Leila)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REDACTION to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, Exhibit B by Petitioner Leyanis Pila Sanchez (Kang, Leila)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re Exhibit B and Exhibit D attached to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SG)
July 8, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-5833678), filed by Leyanis Pila Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Kang, Leila) Document(s)Exhibit B and Exhibit D- sealed pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2. A redacted document will be filed by Counsel. Modified on 7/8/2019-sealed documents (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Langford
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elizabeth Godfrey
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leyanis Pila Sanchez
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Aaron Korthuis
Represented By: Leila Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?