Haq v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance
Plaintiff: Sayeda Haq
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv01040
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIPT from Snohomish County Superior Court re: #9 Order on Motion to Remand. (PM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER to Snohomish County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (TH) (cc: Snohomish County Superior Court)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting parties' #7 Stipulated Motion to Remand. The case is remanded to the Snohomish County Superior Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VACATING THE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion and in light of the Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Remand Back to Supreme Court & Dismissal of Specific Claims with Prejudice filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance [#7], hereby orders the Status Conference set on 8/6/19 @ 9:00 a.m. vacated. No appearances by counsel or the parties shall be necessary unless otherwise so ordered in a separate written order to follow.(PP)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Remand Back to Sup Ct & Dismissal of Specific Claims with Prejudice, filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance. Noting Date 7/31/2019, (Leid, Rory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance (O'Neill, Alison)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/15/2019. (SNP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
July 8, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Neill, Alison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19-2-04856-31; (Receipt # 0981-5833891), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(O'Neill, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haq v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayeda Haq
Represented By: Rico Tessandore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alison Elyse O'Neill
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Alison Elyse O'Neill
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?