Lykinwolfe Inc v. In the Light Urns Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lykinwolfe, Inc. dba Raj Urns and Lykinwolfe Inc
Defendant: Suan Fraser, In the Light Urns, Inc., Susan Fraser and In the Light Urns Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01060
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SWT)
August 8, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. See parties' #9 Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal of All Claims. No order is required per FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (SWT)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal of All Claims, filed by Defendants Susan Fraser, In the Light Urns Inc. Noting Date 8/8/2019, (Chamberlin, Donna)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case (AE)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/26/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donna M Chamberlin on behalf of Defendants Susan Fraser, In the Light Urns Inc. (Chamberlin, Donna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lykinwolfe Inc (Alaniz, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants In the Light Urns Inc and Susan Fraser. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Lykinwolfe Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/17/2019. (GT)
July 10, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for copyright infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5837333) Attorney Richard R Alaniz added to party Lykinwolfe, Inc. dba Raj Urns(pty:pla), filed by Lykinwolfe, Inc. dba Raj Urns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons In the Light Urns, Inc., #3 Summons Susan Fraser)(Alaniz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lykinwolfe Inc v. In the Light Urns Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suan Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Light Urns, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fraser
Represented By: Donna M Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Light Urns Inc
Represented By: Donna M Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lykinwolfe, Inc. dba Raj Urns
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Represented By: Richard R Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lykinwolfe Inc
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Represented By: Richard R Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?