Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment et al v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Plaintiff: Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment, Paula Spina and Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy and Todd C Mellon
Case Number: 2:2019cv01062
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Cases for All Purposes by parties (Harman, Brigman)
August 27, 2019 JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/8/2019. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/1/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/22/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brigman L Harman on behalf of Defendants Todd C Mellon, United States Department of the Navy. (Harman, Brigman)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment, Paula Spina (Griefen, Zachary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01041-MJP; 2:19-cv-01059-BJR, by Plaintiffs Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment, Paula Spina. (Griefen, Zachary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (MET)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Todd C Mellon, United States Department of the Navy (SNP)
July 11, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SNP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment (Griefen, Zachary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Todd C Mellon, United States Department of the Navy (Receipt # 0981-5837502), filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment, Paula Spina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Griefen, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment et al v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment
Represented By: Claudia Newman
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Spina
Represented By: Claudia Newman
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment
Represented By: Claudia Newman
Represented By: Zachary Knox Griefen
Represented By: David A Bricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C Mellon
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?