Marine Carpenters Pension Fund v. Vigor Industrial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marine Carpenters Pension Fund
Defendant: Vigor Marine, LLC, Vigor Industrial, LLC, Cascade General, Everett Shipyard, Vigor Shipyards, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc and Vigor Marine LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01085
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AMENDED by Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Marine LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc.(Cross, Bruce)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vigor Industrial LLC for Vigor Marine LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Vigor Marine LLC (Cross, Bruce)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc for Vigor Shipyards Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Vigor Shipyards Inc (Cross, Bruce)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Vigor Industrial LLC (Cross, Bruce)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Marine LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc.(Cross, Bruce)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Vigor Marine LLC, via National Registered Agents Inc., its Registered Agent on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marine Carpenters Pension Fund. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Vigor Shipyards Inc. via National Registered Agents Inc, its Registered Agent on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marine Carpenters Pension Fund. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Vigor Industrial LLC via National Registered Agents Inc, its Registered Agent on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marine Carpenters Pension Fund. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jeffrey G Maxwell for Plaintiff Marine Carpenters Pension Fund from 8/5-6/2019, 8/12-13/2019, 8/29-9/3/2019, and 9/24-27/2019. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Marine Carpenters Pension Fund (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Attorney Jeffrey C Minzel for Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Marine LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bruce Michael Cross on behalf of Defendants Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Marine LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc. (Cross, Bruce)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 11/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Marine LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/23/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
July 16, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES, FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF, AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5844994) Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Marine Carpenters Pension Fund(pty:pla), filed by Marine Carpenters Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Vigor Industrial, LLC, #3 Summons to Vigor Shipyards, Inc., #4 Summons to Vigor Marine, LLC)(Maxwell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Carpenters Pension Fund v. Vigor Industrial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Shipyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial LLC
Represented By: Bruce Michael Cross
Represented By: Jeffrey C Minzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards Inc
Represented By: Bruce Michael Cross
Represented By: Jeffrey C Minzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Marine LLC
Represented By: Bruce Michael Cross
Represented By: Jeffrey C Minzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?