Munger v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Munger and Matthew Munger
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01088
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration.(Lambert, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration. (Lambert, Michelle)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on US Attorney Generals Office on 7/23/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney Generals Office on 7/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Social Security Admin on 7/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on US Attorney US ATG - Wa on 7/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) Modified docket text on 7/22/2019 (MW).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Social Security Administration (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs Social Security Administration (Receipt # 0981-5845374) Attorney Brandon K. Batchelor added to party Matthew Munger(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon K. Batchelor added to party Michael Munger(pty:pla), filed by Matthew Munger, Michael Munger. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batchelor, Brandon) Modified on 7/16/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munger v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Munger
Represented By: Brandon K. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Munger
Represented By: Brandon K. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?