Chen v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Shu Chen
Defendant: Weekly Disability Income Insurance for Employees of First Financial Northwest, First Financial Northwest, Inc., The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, First Financial Northwest, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, First Financial Northwest Inc and First Financial Northwest Inc Health and Welfare Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01101
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (MW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Shu Chen (Crawford, Melton)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Andrew Escobar, on behalf of Defendants First Financial Northwest, Inc.; Weekly Disability Income Insurance for Employees of First Financial Northwest; and First Financial Northwest, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, on 8/28/2019. (Crawford, Melton)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shu Chen.(Crawford, Melton)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on First Financial Northwest, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan on 7/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shu Chen. (Crawford, Melton)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Weekly Disability Income Insurance for Employees of First Financial Northwest on 7/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shu Chen. (Crawford, Melton)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on First Financial Northwest, Inc. on 7/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shu Chen. (Crawford, Melton)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company c/o Washington State Insurance Commissioner on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff Shu Chen. (Crawford, Melton)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) First Financial Northwest Inc, First Financial Northwest Inc Health and Welfare Plan, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Weekly Disability Income Insurance for Employees of First Financial Northwest (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SNP)
July 17, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5847894) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Shu Chen(pty:pla), filed by Shu Chen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Crawford, Melton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly Disability Income Insurance for Employees of First Financial Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Northwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Northwest, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Northwest Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Northwest Inc Health and Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shu Chen
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?