Discovery Park Community Alliance et al v. City of Seattle
Petitioner: Discovery Park Community Alliance and Elizabeth A Campbell
Respondent: City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2019cv01105
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Roger Douglas Wynne for Respondent City of Seattle from 09/05/19-09/13/2019. (Wynne, Roger)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Petitioners Elizabeth A Campbell, Discovery Park Community Alliance. Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Frohlich, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER re #10 Notice of Termination of Legal Representation filed by Elizabeth A Campbell. (MW)
August 9, 2019 NOTE re: Document #10 . Withdrawal of attorney is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be turned off until corrected. Attorney withdrawals must comply with LCR 83.2(b). (TH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Termination of Legal Representation ; filed by Petitioners Elizabeth A Campbell, Discovery Park Community Alliance. (TH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE held before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour; Courtroom Deputy Clerk Paul Pierson; Court Reporter Debbie Zurn; Plaintiff(s) Counsel: Daniel Frohlich; Defendant(s) Counsel: Patrick Downs. The case was called and counsel made their appearance. The Court inquires of counsel concerning their desired trial date and time estimate for trial. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel shall be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but understand that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov 2-4 weeks in advance of the trial date regarding the Court`s trial calendar. Case management dates are established as follows: 3 day estimate for a Court Trial is set for 3/23/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2020, Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 11/22/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/19/2020, Discovery cutoff is 120 days before trial, and the dispositive motion filing deadline is 90 days before trial.Counsel shall attend Courtroom Technology Training at least 1 month in advance of the trial date in order to become familiar utilizing the new A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 p.m. on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month in Courtroom 18B. (PP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Non Corporate Disclosure of Plaintiff ; filed by Petitioners Elizabeth A Campbell, Discovery Park Community Alliance. (Frohlich, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT In Lieu of An Answer by Respondent City of Seattle (Wynne, Roger)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Discovery Park Community Alliance must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/25/2019. (GT)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 18, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Respondent City of Seattle (Wynne, Roger)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Attorney re Service of Notice of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Respondent City of Seattle (Wynne, Roger)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-17187-1-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5849512), filed by City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition, #3 Summons, #4 Order Set Case Schedule)(Wynne, Roger) Modified on 7/18/2019 (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discovery Park Community Alliance et al v. City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Discovery Park Community Alliance
Represented By: Daniel J Frohlich
Represented By: Thomas L Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth A Campbell
Represented By: Daniel J Frohlich
Represented By: Thomas L Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Seattle
Represented By: Patrick Downs
Represented By: Roger Douglas Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?