Ozone International LLC v. Wheatsheaf Group Limited
Plaintiff: Ozone International, LLC and Ozone International LLC
Defendant: Wheatsheaf Group Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv01108
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Daniel Kittle filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #56 MOTION FOR INTRADISTRICT REASSIGNMENT AND CONSOLIDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kittle, Daniel)
October 8, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION FOR INTRADISTRICT REASSIGNMENT AND CONSOLIDATION , filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/23/2020, (Kittle, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Curt Roy Hineline and James Raymond Morrison for Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, Counter Defendant Ozone International LLC. (Hineline, Curt)
September 22, 2020 Attorney Daniel Adam Kittle added for Ozone International LLC per #54 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
September 22, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Schaer on behalf of Plaintiff Ozone International LLC. (Schaer, Aaron)
August 7, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, TO RESPONSE to #45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails (Todaro, Anthony)
August 3, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Curt Roy Hineline in Support of Plaintiff Ozone International, LLC's Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Hineline, Curt)
August 3, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, to #45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hineline, Curt)
July 31, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION for Protective Order (Todaro, Anthony)
July 29, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Curt Roy Hineline in Support of Plaintiff Ozone International, LLC's Response to Defendant's Motion to Enter Proposed Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #43 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Hineline, Curt)
July 29, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, to #43 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hineline, Curt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Todd Takada filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails (Todaro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Austin Rainwater filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Todaro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION Leave to Review Former TriStrata Employee's Emails , filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2020, (Todaro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Austin Rainwater filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #43 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Todaro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order) Noting Date 7/31/2020, (Todaro, Anthony)
May 29, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Virginia A Weeks on behalf of Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Weeks, Virginia)
May 15, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel Anthony Sterling ; filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC. (Hineline, Curt)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 3-7 days. BENCH TRIAL is set for 7/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/13/2021, Discovery completed by 3/15/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/13/2021, Motions in Limine due by 6/14/2021, Pretrial Order due by 6/28/2021, Trial briefs, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 7/6/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 12, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3-7. (Morrison, James)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER REQUIRING UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. Updated Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2020. (VE)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Defendant's #21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot Defendant's #30 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 PRAECIPE re #34 Reply to Response to Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 PRAECIPE re #34 Reply to Response to Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
October 25, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, TO RESPONSE to #30 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery (Todaro, Anthony)
October 23, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of James R. Morrison filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #30 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morrison, James)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, to #30 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery. (Morrison, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Austin Rainwater filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #30 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Todaro, Anthony)
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2019, (Todaro, Anthony)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Anthony Todaro filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Todaro, Anthony)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Katarzyna Zwolinska-Silveira filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Todaro, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 Third DECLARATION of Jonathan Brandt filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of James R. Morrison filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morrison, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, to #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Morrison, James)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges it has received and reviewed the parties' #22 Joint Status Report, but finds good cause to defer entry of a case schedule pending the Court's ruling on the #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited and Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (VE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-7. (Morrison, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Counter Claimant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/4/2019, (Todaro, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ozone International LLC.(Morrison, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Anthony R Sterling for Plaintiff Ozone International LLC, Counter Defendant Ozone International LLC from September 16 - October 2, 2019. (Sterling, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2019, Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Grosvenor Estate for Wheatsheaf Group Limited, Wheatsheaf Group Limited. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wheatsheaf Group Limited (Todaro, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Ozone International LLC by Wheatsheaf Group Limited.(Todaro, Anthony)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited on 7/23/2019 (Morrison, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
July 21, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental DECLARATION of Jonathan Brandt filed by Plaintiff Ozone International LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Hineline, Curt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Anthony James filed by Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todaro, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Austin Rainwater filed by Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Todaro, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited, to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Todaro, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Pending Defendant's response, the Court anticipates issuing a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion on Monday, 7/22/2019. (VE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Todaro, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO OPPOSE ; filed by Defendant Wheatsheaf Group Limited. (Todaro, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wheatsheaf Group Limited (ST)
July 18, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jonathan Brandt filed by Plaintiff Ozone International, LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Morrison, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Ozone International, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2019, (Morrison, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ozone International, LLC (Morrison, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Wheatsheaf Group Limited (Receipt # 0981-5849968), filed by Ozone International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Morrison, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozone International LLC v. Wheatsheaf Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheatsheaf Group Limited
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Austin M. Rainwater
Represented By: Virginia A Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozone International, LLC
Represented By: Anthony R Sterling
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozone International LLC
Represented By: Anthony R Sterling
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Represented By: Aaron Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?