Ma v. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Roland Ma
Defendant: Department of Education and University of Southern California
Case Number: 2:2019cv01112
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF USCA (19-35726) as to #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Roland Ma. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (CDA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to Correct Telephone Number; Filed by Plaintiff Roland Ma. (Plaintiff's telephone number corrected on docket.) (SWT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER ( #19-35726) as to #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Roland Ma. Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct this deficiency within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The fee is payable to the District Court.(GT) Modified on 8/27/2019 to add filing fee payment information (GT).
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT - Email Correspondence with Financial Unit; filed by Plaintiff Roland Ma. (TH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL (19-35726) to Ninth Circuit (IFP denied 8/23/2019) re #15 Order on Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Roland Ma. . (cc: USCA) (CDA) Modified on 8/27/2019 to add CCA# (GT).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING #9 Report and Recommendation. The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's objections (Dkt. No. #13 ); The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion to strike (Dkt. No. #8 ); Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP is DENIED. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to timely pay the filing fee, his complaint will be dismissed. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee owing in Ma v. Department of Education, et al., Case No. C19-0399-JCC (W.D. Wash. 2019). If Plaintiff fails to timely pay the filing fee, his complaint in this case will be dismissed. Plaintiff shall not file any new civil lawsuits in this District until he has paid this filing fee. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Roland Ma to #9 Report and Recommendations,. filed by Defendant University of Southern California (Jaeger, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Roland Ma to #9 Report and Recommendation. Noted by Clerk for 8/22/2019, (TH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant University of Southern California re #11 Declaration (non motion), #10 Notice of Related Case (Jaeger, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of AnneMarie McDowell Hoovler re #10 Notice of Related Case by Defendant University of Southern California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jaeger, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01778, 2:19-cv-00399, 2:19-cv-01112, 2:19-cv-6429, 19-35596, 19-35400, by Defendant University of Southern California. (Jaeger, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Roland Ma and #8 MOTION to Strike #6 Declaration of Defendant University of Southern California, filed by Roland Ma. Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2019, Noting Date 8/19/2019, signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #6 Declaration of Defendant University of Southern California, filed by Plaintiff Roland Ma, Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019. (SWT)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant University of Southern California re #6 Declaration (non motion), (Jaeger, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION by Defendant University of Southern California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Jaeger, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Roland Ma. (TH)
July 19, 2019 Attorney AnneMarie M. Hoovler for University of Southern California added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Anthony Jaeger on behalf of Defendant University of Southern California. (Jaeger, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 8/19/2019 to correct (GT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Petitioner Roland Ma. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Request for Pro Bono Mediation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 PROPOSED Summons, #5 PROPOSED Summons, #6 PROPSED Application for Court Appointed Counsel, #7 email)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ma v. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Southern California
Represented By: AnneMarie M. Hoovler
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?