Navigators Specialty Insurance Company v. Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Plaintiff: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Resource Transition Consultants, LLC and Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01122
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard A. Simpson for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward R Brown for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard A. Simpson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5906434 (Forsberg, Carl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward R. Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5906427 (Forsberg, Carl)
August 30, 2019 Attorney Gregory L Harper added re #5 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Resource Transition Consultants LLC. (STP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/3/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (TF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/3/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson; Defendant's answer due 9/18/2019. (KMP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Resource Transition Consultants LLC. Noting Date 8/22/2019, (Davis, Charles)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Resource Transition Consultants LLC (Davis, Charles)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles K Davis on behalf of Defendant Resource Transition Consultants LLC. (Davis, Charles)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Susan P. White, on behalf of Resource Transition Consultants, LLC, on 8/1/2019. (Forsberg, Carl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Forsberg, Carl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Resource Transition Consultants LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
July 22, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SNP)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/29/2019. (SNP)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Resource Transition Consultants, LLC (Receipt # 0981-5852554), filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Registered Agent, #4 Summons Business)(Forsberg, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company v. Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carl Edward Forsberg
Represented By: Edward R Brown
Represented By: Richard A. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Transition Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?