People Media Factory Inc et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Srinivas Gatla, Srinivas Lakkoju, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride, People Media Factory, Pathan Khalid Khan, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Kailash Mukhiya and People Media Factory Inc
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, The United States of America, Kevin McAleenan and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01126
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. This case is dismissed without an award of costs to any party pursuant to the parties' #17 Stipulated MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNDER FRCP 41(a). (VE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNDER FRCP 41(a), filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. Noting Date 8/20/2019, (Pauw, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Priscilla To-Yin Chan on behalf of Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America. (Chan, Priscilla)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/19/2019, Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America. (Lambert, Michelle)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Pauw, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Attorney's Office on 7/24/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Pauw, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to The United States of America on 7/24/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Pauw, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Kevin McAleenan on 7/24/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Pauw, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli on 7/24/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Pauw, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) Noting Date 7/23/2019, (Pauw, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory Inc, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride (Pauw, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/29/2019. (ST)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ST)
July 22, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Pauw, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Srinivas Gatla, Pathan Khalid Khan, Vivek Kuchibotla, Ravi Kumar, Srinivas Lakkoju, Kailash Mukhiya, People Media Factory, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride. (Pauw, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5852820) Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Srinivas Gatla(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Pathan Khalid Khan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Vivek Kuchibotla(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Ravi Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Srinivas Lakkoju(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Kailash Mukhiya(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party People Media Factory(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Pauw added to party Bala Tripura Sunari Saride(pty:pla), filed by Pathan Khalid Khan, Srinivas Lakkoju, Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy, Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda, Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha, Vivek Kuchibotla, Bala Tripura Sunari Saride, Ravi Kumar, People Media Factory, Kailash Mukhiya, Srinivas Gatla.(Pauw, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People Media Factory Inc et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Srinivas Gatla
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Srinivas Lakkoju
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Kuchibotla
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Kumar
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hari Chandra Prasad Yarlagadda
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bala Tripura Sunari Saride
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Media Factory
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pathan Khalid Khan
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venkata Subba Raju Penumatsha
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanguturi Ram Mohana Reddy
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailash Mukhiya
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Media Factory Inc
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Represented By: Robert H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?